HI HB601 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes changes to state law relating to public conveyances to the Americans With Disabilities Act. (HB601 HD1)
Title
Service Animals; Definitions; ADA Rules; FHA
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-24-11 2:15PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 597) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chang, Coffman, Har, Herkes, Ito, Nakashima, Pine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Carroll, Morita. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-16-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Re-referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 15 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HLT/HSG, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB892 (Same As) 2011-07-05 - (H) Act 175, on 7/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1279).