HI HB584 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for special inspection and certification of reconstructed vehicles prior to operation upon a public highway.
Title
Motor Vehicles; Reconstructed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-11-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=584&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB584_.HTM |