HI HB581 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that condominium property managers, associations of apartment owners, and planned community associations make association documents available to owners and their respective agents. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB581 HD1)
Title
Condominiums; Residential Real Property; Planned Community
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 589) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-02-16 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chang, Coffman, Har, Herkes, Ito, Pine, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Carroll, Morita, Nakashima. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-16-11 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB714 (Same As) 2011-03-22 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Har excused (2).