HI HB578 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB578
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the qualifying age for the preschool open doors program to children four years old and younger.
Title
Relating To Preschool Open Doors Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 02-01-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Re-referred to HUS, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB578 (Carry Over) 2017-02-01 - The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB497 (Same As) 2017-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB497 (Same As) 2017-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=578&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB578_.HTM |