HI HB567 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the legislative reference bureau to conduct a study on telework and the use of alternative work schedules for state employees. Requires state departments and agencies to cooperate with the legislative reference bureau. Requires the legislative reference bureau to submit a report of its findings and recommendations, including proposed legislation, to the legislature no later than twenty days prior to the convening of the regular session of 2022. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1).
2021-02-05HouseReported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 21) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-02HouseThe committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to LAT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB830 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback