HI HB546 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - (S) Act 034, 5/2/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - (S) Act 034, 5/2/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination on the basis of gender identity or expression as a public policy matter and specifically with regard to employment. (SD1)
Title
Civil Rights; Nondiscrimination; Gender Identity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | (S) Act 034, 5/2/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134). | |
2011-05-02 | (H) Act 034, on 5/2/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1134). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 648). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Kim. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 653). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson, Riviere, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Carroll, Thielen excused (2). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House agrees to Senate amendment(s). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 585). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 474) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ryan). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1128) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-04-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 28). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Cullen, Fontaine, Har, Pine, Thielen, Ward, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Johanson, Riviere voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, Marumoto, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (7). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Deferred one day 03-04-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 639), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Wooley excused (1). | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki, Fontaine, Johanson; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-28-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |