HI HB535 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the designation of temporary nighttime parking lots in each county to provide safe overnight parking for homeless individuals who live and sleep in their motor vehicles and who would otherwise park overnight on public or private roads or property. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Homelessness; Temporary Nighttime Parking Lots; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 949) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 235). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Jordan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cheape, Cullen, Fukumoto, Johanson, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamane voting no (8) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 880) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Belatti, Cheape, Fale, Hanohano, Jordan, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har excused (2). |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 175) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-04 | House | Re-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2013-01-28 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 01-28-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |