HI HB532 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB532
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a minimum fine of $500 and maximum fine of $4,000, in addition to any other penalty, for the misdemeanor offense of reckless endangering in the second degree under certain circumstances, such as boarding a commercial flight into the State after having tested positive for COVID-19.
Title
Relating To Reckless Endangering.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB532 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to PDP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Commercial Flights
Coronavirus Disease 2019
Fine
Public Health
Reckless Endangering in the Second Degree
Coronavirus Disease 2019
Fine
Public Health
Reckless Endangering in the Second Degree
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=532&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB532_.HTM |