HI HB499 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB499
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of "underserved" or "at-risk" children as it relates to the priority given to these children for the Preschool Open Doors program. Provides that priority among undeserved or at-risk children shall be given to children whose family income is at or below 250 per cent of the federal poverty level. Takes effect 7/1/2051. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Preschool Open Doors Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HMS/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1016) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HMS/EDU, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 101). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 906), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 716) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1189 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB499 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB499 (Carry Over) 2017-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.