HI HB474 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB474
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-14 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii at Hilo, the department of health, department of land and natural resources, and department of agriculture for programs, studies, and activities related to rat lungworm disease.
Title
Relating To Rat Lungworm Disease.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:03PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Souki excused (2). |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2017-01-27 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-26 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-27-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB474 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB272 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:15PM in conference room 329.
SB272 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:15PM in conference room 329.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=474&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB474_.HTM |