HI SB272 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:15PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii at Hilo for programs, studies, and activities related to the prevention and eradication of rat lungworm disease. (SB272 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Rat Lungworm Disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:15PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-27SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 10:15AM in conference room 329.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:15AM in conference room 329.
2017-04-20SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 10:15AM in conference room 329.
2017-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 3:15PM in conference room 329.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Baker, Riviere Co-Chairs; Ruderman.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Creagan, McKelvey, DeCoite Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Thielen.
2017-04-07HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540).
2017-04-07SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 455).
2017-04-06HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1664), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola.
2017-03-30HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-31-17 3:15PM in conference room 308.
2017-03-30HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-31-17.
2017-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-30-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-03-24HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
2017-03-24HouseReported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245), recommending referral to FIN.
2017-03-21HouseThe committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing.
2017-03-17HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:02PM in House conference room 309.
2017-03-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
2017-03-17HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1103) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
2017-03-15HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-03-15HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-15-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to AGR, HED, FIN, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 109) in amended form (SD 2).
2017-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-03Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-03SenateReported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 732) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2017-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2017-02-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai.
2017-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/WAM added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2017-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
2017-02-14SenateReported from HRE/WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM.
2017-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2017-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2017-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi.
2017-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on HRE/WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 1:30PM in conference room 224.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to HRE/WTL/AEN, CPH/WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB474 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback