HI HB474 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB474
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii at Hilo for testing, studies, outreach, research, and other activities related to the prevention and eradication of rat lungworm disease. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Rat Lungworm Disease.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 831). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Gabbard, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, McKelvey, Todd Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 580) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3686) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3005) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE/AEN, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 127). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1025-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 757-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ing, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-18 2:00PM. |
2018-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 01-30-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-14 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:03PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Souki excused (2). |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 40), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2017-01-27 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-26 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-27-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB272 (Same As) 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
HB474 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB474 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.