HI HB469 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB469
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 21
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii health systems corporation to enter into a contract for the privatization of food services at Hawaii health systems corporation facilities.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Health Systems Corporation.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2017-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-02-17 at 8:30AM. |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-31-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB469 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Re-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 21
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=469&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB469_.HTM |