HI HB453 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the continuing education requirement for psychologists to include at least three credit hours of ethics training and at least two credit hours of domestic violence training.
Title
Psychologist Continuing Education; Ethics; Domestic Violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-03 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-04-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-15. |
2015-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 01-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 01-29-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB391 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=453&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB453_.HTM |