HI HB450 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB450
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of human services, when determining income eligibility for child care subsidies, to consider special circumstances, such as the retroactive payment of workers' compensation or temporary disability insurance benefits, that cause the monthly gross income of a parent, guardian, or other responsible party to exceed the eligible monthly gross income. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
Rep. May Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 160). |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett. |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 346) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato. |
2023-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-02-23 9:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB450 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=450&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB450_HD1_.HTM |