HI HB447 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes certain unnecessary and redundant reporting responsibilities of the family courts and the Department of Human Services in cases where temporary restraining orders are sought for alleged domestic abuse involving a family or household member who is a minor or incapacitated person. (HB447 HD1)
Title
Domestic Abuse; Department of Human Services; Family Court; Report
Sponsors
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2). |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 47) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB390 (Same As) 2015-02-17 - The committee on HSH deferred the measure.