HI HB446 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Address Confidentiality Program to help survivors of domestic violence, sexual assault, and stalking to relocate and keep their addresses confidential. Creates the Address Confidentiality Program Surcharge Fund. (HB446 HD1)
Title
Address Confidentiality Program; Domestic Violence; Sexual Offense; Stalking ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1). |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-02-03 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Jordan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-03-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB384 (Same As) 2015-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4).