HI HB439 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Department of Agriculture to implement and operate a Hawaii One Program to allow agricultural producer to develop conservation plans online. (HB439 HD1)
Title
Conservation Plan; Hawaii One Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-19 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-19-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |