HI HB433 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB433
Note: Carry Foward to future HB433
Note: Carry Over of previous HB433
Note: Carry Foward to future HB433
Note: Carry Over of previous HB433
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Assesses a climate change mitigation impact fee on every customer who rents, leases, or utilizes a rental motor vehicle. Establishes the climate change mitigation special fund. Specifies that the impact fees collected shall be deposited to the credit of the general fund; provided that beginning July 1, 2024, the impact fees shall be deposited to the credit of the climate change mitigation special fund. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Climate Change Mitigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/WTL/TRS/EET, WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL/TRS, WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 46). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto voting no (3) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 726), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 511), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 66) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-04-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB433 (Carry Over) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB433 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB433 (Carry Over) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB433 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Re-Referred to AEN/WTL/TRS/EET, WAM.
HB433 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB433 (Carry Over) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB433 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Re-Referred to AEN/WTL/TRS/EET, WAM.