HI HB414 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Addresses the issue of homelessness by creating a statewide, state-funded, subsidized public service employment program. Authorizes subsidies and low-interest loans for employers who participate in the program. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Employment.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] |
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HUS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB414 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to HUS, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=414&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB414_.HTM |