HI HB414 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of public safety to establish performance indicators; requires monthly reports to the legislature, using key performance indicators.
Title
Inmate Rehabilitation; Reentry System; Performance Indicators
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Ward excused (3). | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 402), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Takumi, Pine. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-12-09 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |