HI HB412 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the establishment of one full-time equivalent (1.00 FTE) permanent social worker V position in the Kauai drug court program.
Title
Drug Court; Fifth Circuit; Judiciary; Social Worker V; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Thielen. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-15 at 2:00 pm in room 325. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-06-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=412&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB412_.HTM |