HI HB407 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows representatives of health care provider organizations to serve on the prepaid health advisory council; increases the number of members on the council from seven to nine.
Title
Prepaid Health Care Advisory Council; Health Care
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-28-11 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HLT, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=407 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB407_.HTM |