HI HB373 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends amount of transient accommodations tax revenues allocated to the counties from a specified sum to an unspecified percentage of the revenues collected.
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-18 | House | The committee(s) on TOU recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-18-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=373&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB373_.HTM |