HI HB326 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB326
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Examiner of Drivers to waive the knowledge test for a commercial driver's license applicant who meets the requirements of title 49 Code of Federal Regulations section 383.77 or 383.123(b). (HB326 HD1)
Title
Relating To Commercial Driver's Licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 284) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB326 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).