HI HB276 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Gates, Kong, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, McDermott, Todd voting no (3) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, electronic smoking devices, or e-liquids that are in violation of federal FDA labeling requirements or that market toward children. Bans the sale of flavored tobacco products except for menthol or mentholated products. Prohibits mislabeling of e-liquid products containing nicotine. Establishes fines and penalties for violations. (HB276 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Flavored Tobacco Products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Gates, Kong, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, McDermott, Todd voting no (3) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 639) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Ward.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 11
2019-01-31HouseBill re-scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:05AM in conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1009 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback