HI HB2670 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, M. Lee excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the negotiated partner approach pilot program for energy savings contracts, which allows agencies to forego requests for proposals and negotiate directly with qualified vendors. Requires the pilot program to be operational from July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014. (HB2670 HD1)
Title
Negotiated Partner Approach Pilot Program; Energy Savings Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, M. Lee excused (2). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 589-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Cabanilla, Carroll, Chang, Har, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-14-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2288 (Same As) 2012-04-23 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 797).