HI SB2288 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 797).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 797).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Applies the renewable energy technologies tax credit on a per-property basis. Prohibits a taxpayer from claiming the renewable energy technologies income tax credit for a renewable energy system installed for, a power purchase agreement with any government agency. Increases the credit for systems installed on various types of properties. Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for renewable energy systems for state facilities. Applies to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB2288 HD1)
Title
Renewable Energy Technologies; Renewable Energy Systems; Tax Credit; GO Bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 797). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Espero, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 431). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Marumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, C. Lee, Pine, Takai, Thielen, Ward, Wooley voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1606-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) C. Lee; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-30-12 5:45PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-30-12. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 5:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Giugni, Hanohano, C. Lee, Pine, Takai voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Thielen, Ward, Wooley voting no (4) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1286-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Chang, Har, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-22-12 9:15AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-12. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-20-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 134) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2747) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-12 11:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on on 02-23-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Reported from ENE/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2155) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to ENE/PGM, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |