HI HB2663 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes a high-voltage electric transmission cable system for interisland transmission of electricity in the definition of "public utility", regardless of whether the electricity is generated using nonfossil fuels, provided that the PUC finds that regulation is in the public interest.
Title
Public Utilities; High-Voltage Electric Transmission Cable System
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | (H) The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-12 8:15AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8 | |
2012-01-25 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2663 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2663_.HTM |