HI HB2648 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an advisory committee to evaluate solid waste infrastructure needs. (HB2648 HD2)
Title
Solid Waste; Food; Advisory Committee; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Feki Pouha [R] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-16 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPH, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 346). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Keohokalole, Onishi, Oshiro, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 878-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-11-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |