HI HB2629 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes county police departments to enroll firearms permit applicants and individuals who are registering their firearms into a criminal record monitoring service used to alert police when an owner of a firearm is arrested for a criminal offense anywhere in the country. (SD2)
Title
Criminal History Record Checks; Police; Permits to Acquire Firearms; Firearm Registration; Rap Back System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 652). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Rhoads Co-Chairs; C. Lee. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Espero. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 630) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3487) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K.Kahele. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-30-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3071) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-22-16 1:25PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-16 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Choy, Evans, Ito, Jordan, Keohokalole, Lowen, Oshiro, Pouha voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, DeCoite, Fukumoto Chang, Har, Kawakami, Kong, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward, Yamane voting no (15) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami, Thielen; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-01-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Har, Ito, Jordan, Kawakami, Matsumoto, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 301-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Tupola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2016-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-11-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |