HI HB262 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB262
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to create a dollar-for-dollar matching program for beneficiaries of the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program who use their benefits to purchase Hawaii-grown produce. Appropriates funds. (HB262 HD1)
Title
Relating To Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Incentives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 414) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-30-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB262 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
SB390 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Act 153, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
SB390 (Same As) 2019-07-01 - Act 153, 06/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).