HI HB2609 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and regulates short-term lending in the State such that short-term loans shall not exceed a term of thirty months, require payments not to exceed eight per cent of the borrower's gross monthly income, and other conditions.
Title
Relating To Short-term Loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on IAC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-06-18 10:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2609&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2609_.HTM |