HI HB2596 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Act 046, 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain vessel owners to apply for a certificate of title within twenty days of becoming an owner or within twenty days of establishing principal use of the vessel in waters of the State. Establishes what information is required to be included in an application for a certificate of title; how to deal with transfer of vessel ownership and title; rights of a secured party; and rights of a purchaser other than a secured party. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Uniform Certificate Of Title For Vessels Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateAct 046, 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
2018-06-20HouseAct 046, on 06/20/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1146).
2018-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2018-05-03SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 703).
2018-05-01HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Onishi, Takumi excused (2).
2018-05-01HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2018-05-01SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 694).
2018-04-27HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-05-18.
2018-04-23HouseThe House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Takumi, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2018-04-19HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 10:45AM in conference room 225.
2018-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 785).
2018-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2018-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; L. Thielen.
2018-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Aquino, Takumi, Cullen Co-Chairs; McDermott.
2018-04-06SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 447).
2018-04-05HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2018-04-04HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 480) in amended form (SD 1).
2018-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Tokuda). Transmitted to House.
2018-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-18.
2018-04-03SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3382) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2018-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2018-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-29-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2018-03-23SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2018-03-23SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3187) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2018-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye.
2018-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-18 2:55PM in conference room 224.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to WTL, JDC.
2018-03-02SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-03-02SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 115).
2018-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2018-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 838-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2018-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola.
2018-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2018-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6).
2018-02-15HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 500-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2018-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, McDermott.
2018-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-12-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2018-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2).
2018-02-08HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 121-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2018-02-02HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, McDermott.
2018-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-02-18 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
2018-01-29HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback