HI HB2565 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Pesticide Disposal Collection Program within the Department of Agriculture to provide a one-time, affordable, and environmentally accessible means for the disposal of restricted and nonrestricted use pesticides from a bona fide agricultural entity. Convenes a Pesticide Disposal Collection Program Steering Committee to guide and monitor the program. Increases fines for pesticide use violations. Appropriates funds. Effective 9/1/2020. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417). |
2020-07-08 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2020-07-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 605) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3774) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-07-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 07-02-20 10:00AM in conference room Auditorium. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3441) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 250). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 949-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-27-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 668-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Okimoto, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso, Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:15AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-31 | House | Re-referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR/HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3098 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Health
HDOA
Nonrestricted Use Pesticides
Pesticide Disposal Collection Program
Pesticides
Restricted Use Pesticides
Steering Committee
Department of Health
HDOA
Nonrestricted Use Pesticides
Pesticide Disposal Collection Program
Pesticides
Restricted Use Pesticides
Steering Committee