HI HB2528 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides veterinarians who provide emergency care to an animal immunity from civil liability in the absence of gross negligence. Provides veterinarians who render emergency treatment when there is no veterinarian-client-patient relationship, immunity from civil liability in the absence of gross negligence. Requires veterinarians to report to law enforcement events of animal injury, death, or abuse where there is reasonable cause to believe that it relates to dog fighting or animal abuse and gives veterinarians immunity for civil liability for making the reports. Effective July 1, 2150. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Veterinarians.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 562-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Wednesday, 02-12-20 at 2:15 PM. |
2020-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Saiki excused (2). |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 120-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 01-31-20 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2985 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:05PM in conference room 325.
Subjects
Animal Abuse
Civil Liability Immunity
Dog Fighting
Good Samaritan Protection
Report
Veterinarian-Client-Patient Relationship
Veterinarians
Civil Liability Immunity
Dog Fighting
Good Samaritan Protection
Report
Veterinarian-Client-Patient Relationship
Veterinarians