HI HB252 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires annual reports from the Native Hawaiian Roll Commission. Amends the definition of "qualified Native Hawaiian" to include individuals who meet certain expanded ancestry requirements. Establishes that the Native Hawaiian roll commission is responsible for including in the roll all individuals already registered as Hawaiians or Native Hawaiians through the office of Hawaiian affairs. Repeals directive to amend the Hawaiian Homes Commission Act. Effective July 1, 2050 (part I). Promotes renewable energy in Hawaii by: (1) providing that all penalties, fees, and costs established and collected by the Department of Land and Natural Resources pursuant to Chapter 182, Hawaii Revised Statutes, be deposited in the Special Land and Development Fund; (2) including geothermal resources within the definition of a renewable energy producer; and (3) clarifying the permitting procedures for regulators and renewable energy developers considering geothermal development. Requires the use of an area or site within the conservation district for geothermal resources development to be governed by the board of land and natural resources. Authorizes certain county authorities to issue geothermal resource permits to allow geothermal resources development in an agricultural, rural, or urban district if the development is not considered a permissible use under the applicable county zoning ordinances or general plan. Repeals definition of and deletes references to "reserved lands" in chapter 182, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Effective July 1, 2050 (part II). (SD2).
Title
Native Hawaiians; Recognition; Native Hawaiian Roll Commission; BLNR; Native Hawaiian Traditional and Customary Practice; Mineral Resources; Geothermal Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2014-02-18 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/WTL/ENE/JDL. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 1:15PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-22 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 735). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 1:30PM in conference room 312. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 701). |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Galuteria, Chair; Hee, Gabbard, Co-Chair(s); Solomon, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | House | House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Coffman. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: C. Lee, Hanohano, Rhoads, Luke Co-Chairs; Wooley, Fale. |
2013-04-15 | House | Re-referred to EEP, OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 597) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Green). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-13. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor amendment No. 13 adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 13 offered. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor amendment No. 10 adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 10 offered. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from THA/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in THA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Hee, Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-13 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to THA/JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to THA, JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 198). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 805) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Ito. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 at 2:00 PM. |
2013-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6). |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 270) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 02-06-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |