HI HB2508 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Hawaii Labor Relations Board to admit and consider hearsay evidence.
Title
Related To Administrative Procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2718 (Same As) 2024-05-03 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2508&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2508_.HTM |