MN HF4300 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 29, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearm safe storage standards established and criminal penalties provided for failing to meet those standards, and money appropriated.
Title
Firearm safe storage standards established and criminal penalties provided for failing to meet those standards, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 29, 2024 |
2024-04-25 | House | Author added Smith |
2024-04-25 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-04-18 | House | Authors added Lee, K., and Her |
2024-04-09 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2024-04-08 | House | Author added Keeler |
2024-03-04 | House | Author added Bahner |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-02-29 | House | Author added Lillie |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4312 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Second reading