MN SF4312 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-06 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4300
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-06 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4300
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Standards for the safe storage of firearms and criminal penalties for failing to meet these standards establishment; appropriating money
Title
Standards for the safe storage of firearms and criminal penalties for failing to meet these standards establishment; appropriating money
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4300 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Author stricken Housley |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4300 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Second reading