CA SB1168 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1798.202 of, and to add Section 1798.203 to, the Civil Code, relating to business entities. .
Title
Business entities: Secretary of State: document filings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1168 Limón (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1168 Limón (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2024-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3873.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3531.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.I. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.203 | New Code | See Bill Text |