HI SB2718 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Act 141, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Act 141, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Hawaii Labor Relations Board to admit and consider hearsay evidence. (CD1)
Title
Related To Administrative Procedures.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | Act 141, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2024-07-02 | House | Act 141, on 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 30-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 30-24). |
2024-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Tarnas, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-24 10:01AM; Conference Room 016. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Garrett, Alcos. |
2024-04-02 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 355). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 503). |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti, Gates, Quinlan excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-01 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1585-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Evslin. |
2024-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-21-24 2:05PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kong, Sayama excused (4). |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1164-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-03-14 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 03-14-24 9:15AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2990) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 10:00AM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2272) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Fevella, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 3:10PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LBT, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2508 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to LGO, JHA, referral sheet 3