TN SB1501 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the date, from February 1 to January 15, by which the commissioner must annually report to the governor and the general assembly on the implementation of and compliance with the Schools Against Violence in Education Act. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 39 and Title 49, relative to school violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/23/2024 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1016 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.