HI HB2492 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes regulations on the use of hydrofluorocarbons in state law. Phases out hydrofluorocarbons in favor of alternatives with lower global warming potential. Establishes a preference for products that do not contain hydrofluorocarbons in the state procurement code. Directs the Hawaii State Energy Office and the Environmental Management Division of the Department of Health to study how to increase the use of refrigerants with low global warming potential, reduce the use of hydrofluorocarbons, and recommend how to fund, structure, and prioritize a state program that incentivizes or provides grants to support the elimination of legacy uses of hydrofluorocarbons. Appropriates funds for the study to be performed by the Hawaii State Energy Office. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Hydrofluorocarbons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EET, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 240). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 884-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 654-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3). |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 142-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-02-04 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-04-20 11:25AM in conference room 325. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-20 at 11:25AM. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3078 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to EET/GVO, CPH.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DOH
Environmental Management Division
Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Hawaii State Energy Office
Hydrofluorocarbons
Phase Out
Procurement
Study
DOH
Environmental Management Division
Greenhouse Gas Emissions
Hawaii State Energy Office
Hydrofluorocarbons
Phase Out
Procurement
Study