HI HB240 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-27 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the types of businesses qualified to receive benefits under the state enterprise zone law to include service businesses that provide air conditioning project services from seawater air conditioning district cooling systems. (SD1)
Title
Enterprise Zones; Seawater Air Conditioning
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from ENE/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Harimoto. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to ENE/EDT, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 163). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 782) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-10-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB620 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to ENE/EDT, WAM.