HI HB24 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to use zero-based budgeting principles in formatting the budget for the 2012-2013 fiscal year.
Title
University of Hawaii Budget; Zero-based Budgeting
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Mark Takai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-03-11 2:30PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=24 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB24_.HTM |