HI HB2388 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the Governor's authority to negotiate for the construction of correctional facilities and aligns environmental impact statement and assessment requirements as generally applicable requirements. Appropriates funds for jail facilities for an Oahu Community Correctional Center and relocating Maui Community Correctional Center. Requires a feasibility report on development of Oahu Community Correctional Center land. Effective 7/1/2076. (SD2)
Title
Correctional Facilities; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 3:35PM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-16 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 656). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Gabbard, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Espero, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, C. Lee, Yamane, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2016-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2016-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 606) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Ihara, Kim, Wakai . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3549) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-16 2:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2950) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Inouye. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, Wakai. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WLA, WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 301). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 998-16) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ing, Jordan, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3). |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 618-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Pouha. |
2016-02-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ing, Nishimoto, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Pouha. |
2016-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2016-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP/WAL with Representative(s) Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, LoPresti, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Thielen, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1). |
2016-02-09 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 130-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP/WAL. |
2016-02-04 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, Nakashima, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Tupola; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-04-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to PBS, EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2917 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.