HI HB2332 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Joint Formulary Advisory Committee established under chapter 457, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and allows the Board of Nursing to determine the exclusionary formulary for qualified advanced practice registered nurses with prescriptive authority.
Title
Repeal; Joint Formulary Advisory Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 385-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2016-02-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-12-16 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-01-29 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2861 (Same As) 2016-06-22 - Act 092, 06/21/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1193).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2332&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2332_.HTM |