HI HB2317 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL/CMV/EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL/CMV/EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes duration, environmental, and other restrictions on public lands leased to the military.
Title
Relating To The Leasing Of Public Lands By The Military.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to WAL/CMV/EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2843 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2317&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2317_.HTM |