HI SB2843 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Re-Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes duration, environmental, and other restrictions on public lands leased to the military.
Title
Relating To The Leasing Of Public Lands By The Military.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL, JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2317 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL/CMV/EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2843&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2843_.HTM |